Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Whelan, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nashville, Tennessee, USA

Titular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1823³Born
29 Jun 184017.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Aug 184623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
28 Jan 185935.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
28 Jan 185935.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
8 May 185935.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
21 Feb 186036.7SucceededBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
23 Sep 186340.2ResignedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
12 Feb 186440.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina
18 Feb 187854.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Nashville, Tennessee, USA

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Whelan
Bishop James Whelan O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nashville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScaehan Windgap, County Kilkenny, Diocese of Ossory, Ireland, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 246, and Page 366
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 402
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017