Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joshua Maria (Moody) Young

Deceased

Bishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1808Born
10 Oct 182819.9Converted
1 Apr 183829.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
20 Dec 185345.1AppointedBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
23 Apr 185445.4Ordained BishopBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
18 Sep 186657.8DiedBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Joshua Maria (Moody) Young
Bishop Joshua Maria (Moody) Young (born , died ) Bishop of Erie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShapleigh, ME
Ordained BishopSaint Peter in Chain Cathedral, Cincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 262
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017