Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Joseph Lavialle

Deceased

Bishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1819Born
12 Feb 184424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
7 Jul 186545.9AppointedBishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
24 Sep 186546.1Ordained BishopBishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
11 May 186747.8DiedBishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Joseph Lavialle
Bishop Peter Joseph Lavialle (born , died ) Bishop of Louisville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLavialle, Surgères, France
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Louisville, Diocese of Louisville, Kentucky

  • a priest for 23.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017