Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Quinlan

Deceased

Bishop of Mobile, Alabama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1826BornCloyne, Ireland
30 Aug 185225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
19 Aug 185932.8AppointedBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
4 Dec 185933.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
9 Mar 188356.4DiedBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA

MicroData Summary for John Quinlan:
Bishop John Quinlan (born , died ) Bishop of Mobile

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013