Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cincinnati

Archidioecesis Cincinnatensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Dennis Marion Schnurr, Archbishop
  • Joseph Robert Binzer, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Daniel Edward Pilarczyk, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 19 July 1850
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Ohio
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 22,118 (8,543 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: VI (OH, MI)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: CIN
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholiccincinnati.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 100 East Eighth St., Cincinnati, OH 45202
  • Telephone: (513)421-3131
  • Fax: 421-6225

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cincinnati
19 June 1821ErectedDiocese of Bardstown Diocese of Cincinnati (erected)
8 March 1833Territory LostDiocese of Cincinnati Diocese of Detroit (erected) (Michigan, Wisconsin, Minnesota, and the Dakotas east of the Mississippi River)
23 April 1847Territory LostDiocese of Cincinnati Diocese of Cleveland (erected)
Archdiocese of Cincinnati
19 July 1850ElevatedDiocese of Cincinnati Archdiocese of Cincinnati
3 March 1868Territory LostArchdiocese of Cincinnati Diocese of Columbus (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Cincinnati
1950294,4931,576,50018.7%4194198383516752,956255ap1951
1966538,3142,618,11720.6%4724689405728983,115260ap1967
1970530,0002,609,83720.3%4484919395649202,540256ap1971
1976513,7782,691,90019.1%44437982362427372,238256ap1977
1980505,6672,684,35818.8%450377827611576952,058254ap1981
1990538,4002,791,80019.3%3953107057631105001,611247ap1991
1999547,0002,901,08218.9%3492606098981371771,340235ap2000
2000511,1652,915,62017.5%3302505808811374231,305231ap2001
2001513,4692,805,55718.3%3202425629131374011,125231ap2002
2002516,4702,932,04717.6%3082425509391434061,180230ap2003
2003514,9282,932,04717.6%3082505589221384051,056237ap2004
2004512,1462,951,22817.4%3052475529271363951,127224ap2005
2006498,4932,960,89816.8%2912235149691483621,036221ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014