Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michael David Cardinal Browne, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Paolo alla Regola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1887Born
1903²15.6EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
21 May 191023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Apr 195567.9ElectedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Mar 196274.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 1962³74.8ResignedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Mar 196274.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Paolo alla Regola
5 Apr 196274.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Idebessus
19 Apr 196274.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Idebessus
19 Apr 196274.9ResignedTitular Archbishop of Idebessus
31 Mar 197183.9DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Paolo alla Regola

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael David Browne
(VIAF: 71438844; WikiData: Q749697)
Michael David Cardinal Browne O.P. (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Paolo alla Regola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrangemokler, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopLateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSanto Stefano Rotondo, Hospital, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary Immaculate of The Rosary, Church, Tallaght, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
  • a cardinal for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1962, Number 41
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Mar 1962

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 1 Mar 2023