Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Ossola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche)

Titular Bishop of Verbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1889BornBarone Canavese
29 May 191525.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 194050.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Axomis
29 Sep 194051.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Axomis
1 Sep 194656.9AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
1 Sep 194656.9AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
1 Dec 195162.2ResignedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
1 Dec 195162.2ResignedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
1 Dec 195162.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Verbe
25 Aug 195464.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Ossola:
Bishop Pietro Ossola (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche)

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013