Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Bacci

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eugenio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1885Born
9 Aug 190923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
28 Mar 196074.5Elevated to Cardinal
31 Mar 196074.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eugenio
5 Apr 196276.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colonia in Cappadocia
19 Apr 196276.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colonia in Cappadocia
19 Apr 196276.6ResignedTitular Archbishop of Colonia in Cappadocia
20 Jan 197185.3DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eugenio

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bacci (VIAF: 7511554)
Antonio Cardinal Bacci (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eugenio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGiugnola

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 40
  • op: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1969, Page 41*
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast