Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fiorenzo Cardinal Angelini

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Spirito in Sassia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1916 BornRoma
3 Feb 194023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
27 Jun 195639.9AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
27 Jun 195639.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Messene
29 Jul 195640.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Messene
6 Jan 197760.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
16 Feb 198568.5AppointedPro-President of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers
16 Feb 198568.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Messene
1 Mar 198972.6AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers
28 Jun 199174.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199174.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santo Spirito in Sassia
31 Oct 199680.2RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers
26 Feb 200285.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Spirito in Sassia

MicroData Summary for Fiorenzo Angelini:
Cardinal Fiorenzo Angelini (born ) President Emeritus of Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Jun 1991
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,106
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 67
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013