Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Saverio Ritter

Deceased

Official of the Secretariat of State

Titular Archbishop of Aegina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1884Born
9 Sep 190622.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 193551.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aegina
5 Aug 193551.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Czechoslovakia
11 Aug 193551.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aegina
1939²54.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Czechoslovakia
11 May 194662.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Czechoslovakia
1948¹63.9AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
21 Apr 195167.2DiedOfficial of the Secretariat of State

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Saverio Ritter (VIAF: 12678582)
Archbishop Saverio Ritter (born , died ) Official of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiavenna, Diocese of Como, Italy
Death PlaceLugano, Diocese of Lugano, Switzerland

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 63
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast