Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ernesto Cardinal Ruffini

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1888Born
10 Jul 191022.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mantova, Italy
28 Oct 192840.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities
11 Oct 194557.7AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
8 Dec 194557.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
18 Feb 194658.0Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194658.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
11 Jun 196779.3DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Ruffini (VIAF: 32797620)
Ernesto Cardinal Ruffini (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Benedetto Po

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
  • a cardinal for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast