Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Parodi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Savona e Noli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1899Born
31 Mar 192324.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Sep 194849.5AppointedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
28 Oct 194849.6Ordained BishopBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
15 Jul 197475.3RetiredBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
11 Jan 199595.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Savona e Noli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Parodi
Bishop Giovanni Battista Parodi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Savona e Noli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStella Santa Giustina

  • a priest for 71.7 years
  • a bishop for 46.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast