Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alois Hudal

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Aela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1885Born
19 Jul 190823.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 193348.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aela
18 Jun 193348.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aela
13 May 196377.9DiedTitular Bishop of Aela

MicroData Summary for Alois Hudal (VIAF: 3262577)
Bishop Alois Hudal (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Aela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraz

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast