Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albert Levame

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Ireland

Titular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1881Born
21 May 190524.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 193352.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia
21 Dec 193352.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
21 Dec 193352.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to El Salvador
21 Dec 193352.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Guatemala
4 Feb 193453.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia
Mar 1936³55.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guatemala
3 Oct 193857.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
10 Nov 193958.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uruguay
12 Nov 193958.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
17 Dec 194160.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
3 Oct 194968.7AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
16 Jun 195473.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
5 Dec 195877.8DiedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Albert Levame
Archbishop Albert Levame (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Ireland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonaco

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 11
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 110, and Page 137, and Page 147
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 156, and Page 200, and Page 228
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast