Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marcel Rodié

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Agen

Titular Bishop of Cynopolis in Arcadia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1879BornSorèze
17 Jul 191031.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 192747.8AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
2 Jul 192748.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
7 Mar 193858.6AppointedBishop of Agen, France
15 Feb 195676.6RetiredBishop of Agen, France
15 Feb 195676.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cynopolis in Arcadia
10 Apr 196888.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Agen, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marcel Rodié:
Bishop Jean-Marcel Rodié (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Agen

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013