Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Moses Bosco Anderson, S.S.E. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan

Titular Bishop of Vatarba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1928BornSelma, AL
30 May 195829.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Saint Edmund
2 Dec 198254.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
2 Dec 198254.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vatarba
27 Jan 198354.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vatarba
24 Oct 200375.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
1 Jan 201384.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Moses Bosco Anderson:
Bishop Moses Bosco Anderson S.S.E. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 2 Jan 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015