Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dale Joseph Melczek

Bishop Emeritus of Gary, Indiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1938 BornDetroit
6 Jun 196425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
3 Dec 198244.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
3 Dec 198244.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tragurium
27 Jan 198344.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tragurium
19 Aug 199253.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gary, Indiana, USA
28 Oct 199557.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Gary, Indiana, USA
1 Jun 199657.6SucceededBishop of Gary, Indiana, USA
24 Nov 201476.0RetiredBishop of Gary, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Dale Joseph Melczek:
Bishop Dale Joseph Melczek (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Gary

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gary.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 24 Nov 2014