Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jude Speyrer

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lake Charles, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1929Born
25 Jul 195324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
29 Jan 198050.7AppointedBishop of Lake Charles, Louisiana, USA
25 Apr 198051.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lake Charles, Louisiana, USA
12 Dec 200071.6ResignedBishop of Lake Charles, Louisiana, USA
21 Jul 201384.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Lake Charles, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Jude Speyrer
Bishop Jude Speyrer (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lake Charles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeonville

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 22 Jul 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast