Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas William Lyons

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

Titular Bishop of Murthlacum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1923Born
22 May 194824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
12 Jul 197450.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
12 Jul 197450.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Murthlacum
12 Sep 197450.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Murthlacum
25 Mar 198864.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas William Lyons
Bishop Thomas William Lyons (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Washington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWashington, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Shrine, Washington, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,437

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 May 2020

Quantcast