Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Thomas O’Keefe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Syracuse, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1919BornNew York
17 Apr 194829.0Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
3 Jul 198263.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
3 Jul 198263.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tres Tabernae
8 Sep 198263.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tres Tabernae
16 Jun 198768.2AppointedBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
3 Aug 198768.3InstalledBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
4 Apr 199576.0RetiredBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
2 Sep 199778.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Syracuse, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Thomas O’Keefe:
Bishop Joseph Thomas O’Keefe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Syracuse

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015