Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emerson John Moore

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Curubis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1938Born
30 May 196426.0Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
3 Jul 198244.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
3 Jul 198244.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Curubis
8 Sep 198244.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Curubis
14 Sep 199557.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Emerson John Moore
Bishop Emerson John Moore (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast