Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Michael Cosgrove

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belleville, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1916Born
18 Dec 194327.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
12 Jun 196851.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
12 Jun 196851.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Trisipa
3 Sep 196851.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trisipa
30 Aug 197659.7AppointedBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
28 Oct 197659.9InstalledBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
19 May 198164.4ResignedBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
11 Dec 199276.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Belleville, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for William Michael Cosgrove
Bishop William Michael Cosgrove (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belleville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanton, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio
Ordained PriestCleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast