Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Félix Pelvat, M.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nagpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1845Born
1871¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
2 Oct 189347.8AppointedBishop of Nagpur, India
10 Dec 189347.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nagpur, India
23 Jul 190054.6DiedBishop of Nagpur, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Félix Pelvat
Bishop Charles-Félix Pelvat M.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Nagpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArthaz-Pont-Notre-Dame, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Nagpur, Diocese of Nagpur

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 400
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017