Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Gaetano Sinibaldi, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Allahabad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1844BornMusiolo
1867¹22.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
27 Sep 189954.8AppointedBishop of Allahabad, India
30 Nov 189955.0Ordained BishopBishop of Allahabad, India
5 Jan 190257.1DiedBishop of Allahabad, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Victor Gaetano Sinibaldi:
Bishop Victor Gaetano Sinibaldi O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Allahabad

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013