Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Giuseppe Gentili, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Agra, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1840Born
4 Nov 185918.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Jun 186322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Mar 189756.3AppointedBishop of Allahabad, India
29 Jun 189756.6Ordained BishopBishop of Allahabad, India
27 Aug 189857.7AppointedArchbishop of Agra, India
30 Dec 191676.1DiedArchbishop of Agra, India

MicroData Summary for Carlo Giuseppe Gentili
Archbishop Carlo Giuseppe Gentili O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Agra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBertinoro, Diocese of Bertinoro, Italy
Ordained BishopSte Marie, Convent, Nainital
Death PlaceAgra, Archdiocese of Agra

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,918
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 82, and Page 90
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,897, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast