Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alain Émile Baptiste Planet

Bishop of Carcassonne et Narbonne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1948 Born
24 May 198132.5Ordained PriestPriest of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
28 Jun 200455.6AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
19 Sep 200455.8Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France

MicroData Summary for Alain Émile Baptiste Planet
Bishop Alain Émile Baptiste Planet (born ) Bishop of Carcassonne et Narbonne

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrivas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Carcassonne et Narbonne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast