Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Chrapek, C.S.M.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Radom, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1948Born
1965²16.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of Saint Michael the Archangel
26 Aug 196921.1Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of Saint Michael the Archangel
3 May 197526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Saint Michael the Archangel
25 Mar 199243.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Drohiczyn, Poland
25 Mar 199243.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cataquas
6 Jun 199243.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cataquas
20 Jun 199445.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toruń, Poland
28 Jun 199950.9AppointedBishop of Radom, Poland
18 Oct 200153.2DiedBishop of Radom, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Chrapek (VIAF: 63008141)
Bishop Jan Chrapek C.S.M.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Radom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIwaniska
Ordained BishopCathedral, Drohiczyn, Diocese of Drohiczyn

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,780
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • prof/sole/ab: CB, 14 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast