Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Kazimierz Cardinal Świątek

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus

Cardinal-Priest of San Gerardo Maiella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1914Born
8 Apr 193924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pinsk, Belarus
13 Apr 199176.4AppointedArchbishop of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
13 Apr 199176.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pinsk, Belarus
21 May 199176.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
26 Nov 199480.0Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199480.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Gerardo Maiella
14 Jun 200691.6RetiredArchbishop of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
30 Jun 201196.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Pinsk, Belarus
21 Jul 201196.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Świątek (VIAF: 317285195)
Kazimierz Cardinal Świątek (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Minsk-Mohilev

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWalga, Estonia

  • a priest for 72.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
  • a cardinal for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2006
  • d: CB, 21 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,973
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017