Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Kałwa

Deceased

Bishop of Lublin, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1893Born
1 Jun 191622.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 194955.6AppointedBishop of Lublin, Poland
29 Jun 194955.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lublin, Poland
17 Jul 197480.7DiedBishop of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Piotr Kałwa
Bishop Piotr Kałwa (born , died ) Bishop of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCudzynowice

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast