Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Mazur

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Siedlce, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1920Born
26 Jun 194929.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
25 Apr 196140.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
25 Apr 196140.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bladia
6 Aug 196141.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bladia
24 Oct 196848.3AppointedBishop of Siedlce, Poland
25 Mar 199675.8RetiredBishop of Siedlce, Poland
26 Sep 200888.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Siedlce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Mazur
Bishop Jan Mazur (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Siedlce

EventPlace
Birth PlacePloskie

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 47.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017