Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Czeslaw Kaczmarek

Deceased

Bishop of Kielce, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1895Born
20 Aug 192227.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 193843.1AppointedBishop of Kielce, Poland
4 Sep 193843.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kielce, Poland
26 Aug 196368.3DiedBishop of Kielce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Czeslaw Kaczmarek (VIAF: 3273073)
Bishop Czeslaw Kaczmarek (born , died ) Bishop of Kielce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisewo Malek Sierpca

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast