Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Jan Muszynski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland

Titular Bishop of Mastaura in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1911Born
15 Jun 193523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kielce, Poland
26 Oct 196049.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland
26 Oct 196049.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Mastaura in Asia
27 Aug 196149.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mastaura in Asia
15 Mar 196856.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Edward Jan Muszynski
Bishop Edward Jan Muszynski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZagorzyce

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1967
  • c2+: CB
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast