Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julian Andrzej Wojtkowski

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warmia

Titular Bishop of Murustaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1927 BornPoznan
25 Jun 195023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
17 Aug 196942.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
17 Aug 196942.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Murustaga
22 Aug 196942.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Murustaga
24 Feb 200477.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia, Poland

MicroData Summary for Julian Andrzej Wojtkowski:
Bishop Julian Andrzej Wojtkowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warmia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Warmia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013