Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Dudziec

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

Titular Bishop of Camuliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1906BornRembisze
19 Jun 193225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Płock, Poland
12 Jun 195043.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
12 Jun 195043.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Camuliana
29 Jun 195043.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camuliana
13 Jun 197063.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Piotr Dudziec:
Bishop Piotr Dudziec (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp: CB, 15 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013