Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Jean-Célestin Douais

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1848BornBoujan-sur-Libron
30 May 187426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Montpellier, France
7 Dec 189951.7SelectedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
14 Dec 189951.7ConfirmedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
24 Feb 190051.9Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
29 Mar 190052.0InstalledBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
28 Feb 191566.9DiedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Jean-Célestin Douais:
Bishop Marie-Jean-Célestin Douais (born , died ) Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013