Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Leonard D’Mello

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Karwar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1931BornMangalore
16 Apr 195726.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 197644.8AppointedBishop of Karwar, India
29 Apr 197746.0Ordained BishopBishop of Karwar, India
24 Feb 200775.9RetiredBishop of Karwar, India
19 Jul 201180.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Karwar, India

MicroData Summary for William Leonard D’Mello:
Bishop William Leonard D’Mello (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Karwar

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2007
  • d: CB, 19 Jul 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015