Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Michaelappa

Deceased

Bishop of Mysore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1925Born
6 Apr 195731.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 198661.5AppointedBishop of Mysore, India
27 May 198761.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mysore, India
17 Mar 199367.7DiedBishop of Mysore, India

MicroData Summary for Francis Michaelappa
Bishop Francis Michaelappa (born , died ) Bishop of Mysore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHarobale

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,711
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast