Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Boļeslavs Sloskāns

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Minsk

Titular Bishop of Cillium

Apostolic Administrator of Mohilev


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1893BornSterniene
21 Jan 191723.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 192632.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop
5 May 192632.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cillium
10 May 192632.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cillium
13 Aug 192632.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Minsk, Belarus
13 Aug 192632.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mohilev, Belarus
17 Apr 198187.6DiedApostolic Administrator of Minsk, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Boļeslavs Sloskāns:
Bishop Boļeslavs Sloskāns (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Minsk

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 54.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015