Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Antoni Denisewicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus

Titular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1834Born
17 May 186227.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mohilev, Belarus
16 Apr 186328.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mohilev, Belarus
12 Jun 190873.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus
12 Jun 190873.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
30 Nov 190874.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
13 Dec 191379.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Stefan Antoni Denisewicz
Bishop Stefan Antoni Denisewicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mohilev

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorysów

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,867
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,809
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 68
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast