Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Apolinary Wnukowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Mohilev


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1848BornGrodziec
15 Jun 187223.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 190455.8AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
13 Nov 190456.3Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
16 Jun 190859.9AppointedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
21 May 190960.8DiedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Apolinary Wnukowski:
Archbishop Apolinary Wnukowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Mohilev

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1908
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,463
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 59
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013