Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bl. Antoni Julian Nowowiejski

Deceased

Bishop of Płock, Poland

Titular Archbishop of Silyum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1858Born
10 Jul 188123.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 190850.3AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
6 Dec 190850.8Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
25 Nov 193072.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Silyum
28 May 194183.2DiedBishop of Płock, Poland
13 Jun 1999Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Antoni Julian Nowowiejski
Archbishop Bl. Antoni Julian Nowowiejski (born , died ) Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLubien

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,908, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast