Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pranciškus Karevičius (Karewicz), M.I.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

Titular Archbishop of Scythopolis

Member of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1861³BornGiršinu
2 May 188523.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
17 May 188624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
20 Feb 191452.4AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
17 May 191452.7Ordained BishopBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
31 May 191452.7InstalledBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
23 Mar 192664.5ResignedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
23 Mar 192664.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Scythopolis
24 Apr 192664.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
30 May 194583.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pranciškus Karevičius (Karewicz):
Archbishop Pranciškus Karevičius (Karewicz) M.I.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 329

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 20 Dec 2013