Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Julijans Cardinal Vaivods

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Riga, Latvia

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati

Titular Bishop of Macriana Maior

Apostolic Administrator of Liepāja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1895Born
7 Apr 191822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Liepāja, Latvia
10 Nov 196469.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Riga, Latvia
10 Nov 196469.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana Maior
10 Nov 196469.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Liepāja, Latvia
18 Nov 196469.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macriana Maior
2 Feb 198387.4Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198387.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
24 May 199094.7DiedApostolic Administrator of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Julijans Vaivods
Julijans Cardinal Vaivods (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Riga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVorkova

  • a priest for 72.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
  • a cardinal for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 May 2021

Quantcast