Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonsus Cullinan

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1959 BornLahinch
12 Jun 199435.0Ordained PriestPriest of Limerick, Ireland
2 Feb 201555.7AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
12 Apr 201555.9Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Alphonsus Cullinan:
Bishop Alphonsus Cullinan (born ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Waterford and Lismore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2015
  • bp/c1: CB, 2 Feb 2015
  • ob: CB, 20 Feb 2015
  • c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,473

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015