Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kevin Peter Doran

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1953 Born
6 May 197622.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Dublin, Ireland
6 Jul 197724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
14 May 201460.8AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
13 Jul 201461.0Ordained BishopBishop of Elphin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Kevin Peter Doran (VIAF: 32687961)
Bishop Kevin Peter Doran (born ) Bishop of Elphin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Elphin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 May 2014
  • c01: CB, 14 May 2014
  • ob: CB, 24 May 2014
  • c2+: CB, 22 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Number 18,218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast