Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Peragine, B.

Apostolic Administrator of Southern Albania {Albania Meridionale} (Albanian)

Titular Bishop of Phoenice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1965 Born
15 Sep 198318.2EnteredMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
23 Sep 198419.2First VowsMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
17 Nov 199126.3Solemn VowsMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
10 Mar 199327.7Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
15 Jun 201751.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Southern Albania {Albania Meridionale} (Albanian)
15 Jun 201751.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Phoenice
7 Sep 201752.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phoenice

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Peragine
Bishop Giovanni Peragine B. (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Southern Albania {Albania Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltamura, Archdiocese of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
Ordained BishopSanti Pietro e Paolo, Church, Lushnjė

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Administration of Southern Albania {Albania Meridionale} (Albanian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 10 Jul 2017
  • c2: CB, 15 Aug 2017
  • c34: CB, 21 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Sep 2017