Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Anthony Browne

Bishop of Kerry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1957 Born
4 Jul 198225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Elphin, Ireland
2 May 201356.2AppointedBishop of Kerry, Ireland
21 Jul 201356.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Raymond Anthony Browne
Bishop Raymond Anthony Browne (born ) Bishop of Kerry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAthlone

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kerry.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 May 2013
  • ob: CB, 22 May 2013
  • c2+: CB, 16 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,840

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018