Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gjergj Meta

Bishop of Rrėshen, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1976 Born
21 Apr 200124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Durrės-Tiranė, Albania
15 Jun 201741.1AppointedBishop of Rrėshen, Albania
2 Sep 201741.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rrėshen, Albania

MicroData Summary for Gjergj Meta (VIAF: 305194482)
Bishop Gjergj Meta (born ) Bishop of Rrėshen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDurrės, Archdiocese of Durrės (Durazzo)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rrėshen, Diocese of Rrėshen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rrėshen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 10 Jul 2017
  • c2+: CB, 21 Aug 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,512

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast