Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Duffy

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1958 Born
20 Jun 198224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kilmore, Ireland
17 Jul 201355.2AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
6 Oct 201355.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

MicroData Summary for Francis Duffy
Bishop Francis Duffy (born ) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBawnboy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2013
  • ob: CB, 10 Aug 2013
  • c2+: CB, 5 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 2013, Number 140
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,973

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018