Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Nulty

Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

Apostolic Administrator of Ossory


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1963 Born
12 Jun 198825.0Ordained PriestPriest of Meath, Ireland
7 May 201349.9AppointedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
4 Aug 201350.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
2 Feb 202157.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ossory, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Denis Nulty
Bishop Denis Nulty (born ) Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSlane, County Meath, Diocese of Meath
Ordained PriestSaint Patrick, Church, Slane, County Meath, Diocese of Meath
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Carlow

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kildare and Leighlin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 May 2013
  • ob: CB, 9 May 2013
  • c2+: CB, 15 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,845

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Mar 2021

Quantcast